EP0835642 - Surgical helical fastener with applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states ORIGIN MEDSYSTEMS, INC. 135 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolduc, Lee 761-1/2 Palo Alto Avenue Mountain View, California 94041 / US | 02 /
Kramer, Thomas A. 1149 Orange Avenue San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 03 /
Hodges, Brian A. 360 Sunfish Court Foster City, California 94404 / US | 04 /
McCoy, Tim 2 Cottage Lane San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 05 /
Lunsford, John 3378 Brittan Avenue No. 15 San Carlos, California 94070 / US | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97203204.9 | 07.06.1995 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | US19940286878 | 05.08.1994 Original published format: US 286878 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835642 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835642 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, A61B17/04 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06076 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06171 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0649 (EP,US);
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
Y10S227/901 (EP,US);
Y10S227/902 (EP,US);
Y10S606/91 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1998/16] | Title | German: | Chirurgische schraubenförmige Wundklammer mit einer Vorrichtung zur Anbringung | [1998/16] | English: | Surgical helical fastener with applicator | [1998/16] | French: | Agrafe chirurgicale hélicoidale avec applicateur | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95923760.3 / EP0773742 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.08.2002 | BE | 28.08.2002 | CH | 28.08.2002 | LI | 28.08.2002 | NL | 28.08.2002 | DK | 28.11.2002 | SE | 28.11.2002 | [2005/01] |
Former [2003/48] | AT | 28.08.2002 | |
BE | 28.08.2002 | ||
CH | 28.08.2002 | ||
LI | 28.08.2002 | ||
NL | 28.08.2002 | ||
DK | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 28.08.2002 | |
CH | 28.08.2002 | ||
LI | 28.08.2002 | ||
NL | 28.08.2002 | ||
DK | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 28.08.2002 | |
CH | 28.08.2002 | ||
LI | 28.08.2002 | ||
NL | 28.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | NL | 28.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE295962 (KUHLEMANN) [A] 1 * page 1, column R, lines 51-54; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2033039 (LIMPERT ARTHUR A) [A] 1,9 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]USRE28932E (NOILES ET AL.) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2299548 (MELIN RAYMOND [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 32 * * page 5, lines 1-23; figure - *; | [A]FR2377796 (INST MEDITSINSKOI TEKHNIKI [SU], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0324166 (WECK & CO INC EDWARD [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 51 - column 9, line 13; figures 6-10 *; | [A]WO9014795 (YOON INBAE [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * page 20, line 3 - page 24, line 18 *; | [A]US5163343 (GISH DONALD A [US]) [A] 1* abstract * |