EP0843145 - Heat exchanger manifold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2000/48] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joshi, Shrikant Mukund 49 Hoviland Court Getzville, New York 14068 / US | 02 /
Honey, Ralph John 3 Washington Street Randolph, New York 14772 / US | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97203289.0 | 23.10.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | US19960751592 | 18.11.1996 Original published format: US 751592 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843145 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0843145 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, B21C23/18 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
F28F9/0246 (EP,US);
F28F9/0243 (EP,US);
F28F2220/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49373 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49389 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/04] |
Former [2000/03] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher-Endkammer | [1998/21] | English: | Heat exchanger manifold | [1998/21] | French: | Collecteur pour échangeur de chaleur | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/10] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE640014 (DI PIAZZA) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 4 - paragraph 6; figure - *; | [Y]DE732947 (MANNESMANN AG) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2348763 (CHARRON FRANCIS [FR]) [A] 3 * page 5, line 8 - line 19; figure - *; | [Y]US5119552 (SUTOU NAOYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5178209 (AOKI HISAO [JP], et al) [A] 3* figures 4,5 *; | [A]US5441100 (UEDA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * abstract * | by applicant | US5178209 | US5355941 |