EP0839731 - Metal can with profiled body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ball Packaging Europe GmbH Kaiserswerther Strasse 115 40880 Ratingen / DE | [2003/46] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states Schmalbach-Lubeca Nederland B.V. Zutphenseweg 51051 7418 AH Deventer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Dam, Willem Leendert Pieter Gildeland 13 8162 XL Epe / NL | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/47] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma P.O.Box 18558 2502 EN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2004/46] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, P.O. Box 18558 2502 EN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1998/19] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 97203321.1 | 27.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | NL19961004404 | 01.11.1996 Original published format: NL 1004404 | [1998/19] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839731 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839731 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/12, B65D1/44 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
B65D1/44 (EP,US);
B65D7/46 (EP,US);
Y10S220/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Metalldose mit Profilkörper | [1998/19] | English: | Metal can with profiled body | [1998/19] | French: | Boîte métallique à corps profilé | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.2004 | CH | 21.01.2004 | FI | 21.01.2004 | LI | 21.01.2004 | DK | 21.04.2004 | SE | 21.04.2004 | PT | 21.06.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 21.01.2004 | |
CH | 21.01.2004 | ||
FI | 21.01.2004 | ||
LI | 21.01.2004 | ||
DK | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 21.01.2004 | |
CH | 21.01.2004 | ||
FI | 21.01.2004 | ||
LI | 21.01.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 21.01.2004 | |
FI | 21.01.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 21.01.2004 | |
SE | 21.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB339346 (THOMAS DAVIES) [X] 1,3,4 * page 4, line 71 - line 95; figure 2 *[A] 2; | [XY]US3401826 (ANTHONY MYRON L) [X] 1,2 * column 17, line 70 - column 18, line 24; figure 35 * [Y] 3,4; | [XA]FR2569656 (SALZENBRODT GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 2 - line 10; figure . * [A] 3,4; | [Y]DE9112620U (MAUSER) [Y] 3,4 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 2; figures 1,2 * |