EP0841009 - A device for shaping portions of bread dough or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Italiana Agro Alimentare S.r.l. Via Matteotti, 10 27029 Vigevano (Pavia) / IT | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sigoni, Riccardo Via Cairoli, 35 27029 Vigevano - Pavia / IT | 02 /
Varvello, Franco Via Matteotti, 12 27029 Vigevano - Pavia / IT | 03 /
Rosso, Marco Regione Zuglieno, 59 17026 Noli - Savona / IT | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97203516.6 | 12.11.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI02348 | 12.11.1996 Original published format: IT MI962348 | IT1997MI01158 | 16.05.1997 Original published format: IT MI971158 | [1998/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0841009 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0841009 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841009 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A21C11/04 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
A21C11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, PT, SE [1999/52] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Formen von Brotteigstücken oder dergleichen | [1998/20] | English: | A device for shaping portions of bread dough or the like | [1998/20] | French: | Appareil pour la mise en forme de morceaux de pâte à pain ou similaire | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 19.03.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | 08.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01200536.9 / EP1099379 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2001 | BE | 16.08.2001 | PT | 16.11.2001 | SE | 16.11.2001 | ES | 28.02.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2002/29] | AT | 16.08.2001 | |
BE | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.11.2001 | ||
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 16.08.2001 | |
PT | 16.11.2001 | ||
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/20] | AT | 16.08.2001 | |
SE | 16.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 16.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR781702 (WAALWIJK); | [XAY]US2818645 (MARTIN HENRY C) [X] 1,6,7,16 * column W * [A] 5,8-13,15 [Y] 2-4,17,18; | [A]US2837043 (GRICE HARVEY H, et al); | [A]US3417713 (IRVING SCHWEBEL); | [Y]US3536014 (KUCHURIS LOUIS G, et al) [Y] 2-4 * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US3936255 (BELLACICCO JOSEPH VITO) [A] 1-4,17,18 * column W *; | [A]US3994652 (KUZYK PETER); | [A]DE2831195 (SPERLING REINHARD); | [A]US4789555 (JUDD VIRGINIA L [US]) [A] 20 * column W *; | [YA]US5549467 (SCHULTZ GEORGE A [US]) [Y] 17,18 * column W * [A] 19; | [PX]WO9731539 (YUSUFI NASIER AHMED [NL]) [PX] 1,6,17-19 * the whole document * |