Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0836194
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.03.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
07.04.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
29.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.09.1999 |
First examination report |
|
20.09.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.03.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] |
22.01.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] |
22.01.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] |
27.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.02.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] |
05.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|