Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2939086B | Global Dossier | 25.08.1999 | B2 | JPH0689574 | 29.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP7418492 | 30.03.1992 | JP7180693 | 30.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0836194 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2000 | B1 | EP0836194 | 10.03.1999 | A3 | EP0836194 | 15.04.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP7418492 | 30.03.1992 | EP93302415 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5557231 | 17.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP7418492 | 30.03.1992 | US29105794 | 15.08.1994 | US3898793 | 29.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0564204 | Global Dossier | 28.09.1994 | A3 | EP0564204 | 06.10.1993 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP7418492 | 30.03.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69328743T | 07.09.2000 | T2 | DE69328743D1 | 29.06.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP7418492 | 30.03.1992 | Type | Earlier application | EP0564204 |