EP0836194 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Yasuo, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. LSI Kenkyusho, 1, Mizuhara, 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Tadashi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. LSI Kenkyusho, 1, Mizuhara, 4-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97203535.6 | 29.03.1993 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | JP19920074184 | 30.03.1992 Original published format: JP 7418492 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0836194 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0836194 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836194 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/14, G11C11/407, H01L27/12 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
H03K19/0016 (EP,US);
G11C11/4074 (EP,US);
G11C5/146 (EP,US);
H01L27/0218 (EP,US);
H01L27/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/16] | G11C5/14, G11C11/407 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/16] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung | [1998/16] | English: | Semiconductor device | [1998/16] | French: | Dispositif à semi-conducteurs | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 23.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93302415.0 / EP0564204 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]JPH04359470 ; | [A]EP0118108 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4837460 (UCHIDA YUKIMASA [JP]); | [A]EP0473397 (SHARP KK [JP]) |