EP0918044 - Solar control glazing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAVERBEL Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states GLAVERBEL Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Decroupet, Daniel Try al Hutte 21 5070 Fosse-La-Ville / BE | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Farmer, Guy Dominic, et al AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre IP Department Rue Louis Blériot, 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Farmer, Guy, et al GLAVERBEL, Department of Intellectual Property, Centre R & D, Rue de l'Aurore 2 6040 Jumet / BE | Application number, filing date | 97203602.4 | 19.11.1997 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0918044 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/36 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
C03C17/3618 (EP,US);
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3626 (EP,US);
C03C17/3634 (EP,US);
C03C17/366 (EP,US);
C03C17/3681 (EP,US);
Y10T442/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/21] | Title | German: | Sonnenschutzverglasung | [1999/21] | English: | Solar control glazing | [1999/21] | French: | Vitrage de protection solaire | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0336257 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 6, line 3 - line 46 * * column 8, line 38 - line 44 * * column 9, line 23 - line 27 *; | [X]EP0645352 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 4 *; | [X]EP0722913 (GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES [US]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * page 5, line 50 - page 7, line 15 *; | [X]EP0761618 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 42 *; | [X]EP0792847 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 52 * * page 4, line 43 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0718250 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 7 - line 23 * |