Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
21.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] |
11.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
21.03.2000 | Change - extension states | |
01.02.2000 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
01.02.2000 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
21.01.2000 | Definitive list of designations | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] |
01.01.2000 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
13.05.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] |