Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4019291B | Global Dossier | 12.12.2007 | B2 | JPH10200829 | 31.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9615372 | 13.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0848547 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2005 | B1 | EP0848547 | 17.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9615372 | 13.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69733185T | 11.05.2006 | T2 | DE69733185D1 | 09.06.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9615372 | 13.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2757336 | 19.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9615372 | 13.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19980063974 | 07.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9615372 | 13.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6191816 | 20.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR9615372 | 13.12.1996 |