EP0848547 - Interface circuit for video camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darthenay, Frédéric Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Morisson, Richard Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/25] | Caron, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97203788.1 | 03.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | FR19960015372 | 13.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9615372 | [1998/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848547 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848547 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/16 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
H04N5/185 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schnittstellenschaltung für Videokamera | [1998/25] | English: | Interface circuit for video camera | [1998/25] | French: | Circuit d'interface pour caméra vidéo | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 23.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2071959 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,4 * column W *; | [A]EP0064316 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1* column W *; | [A]FR2535566 (RCA CORP [US]) [A] 1,4 * column W *; | [A]EP0280123 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 39 - column 9, line 38 *; | [A]US5329312 (BOISVERT DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 6, line 14 - column 10, line 22 *; | [A]EP0625849 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1 * column W * |