EP0825671 - Dual frequency band planar array antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Vought Systems Corporation 1701 W. Marshall Grand Prairie, TX 75051 / US | [2000/33] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Vought Systems 1701 W. Marshall Grand Prairie, TX 75051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keough, Shaun M. 3012 Bramble Oaks Court Bedford, Tarrant, Texas 76021 / US | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97250130.8 | 22.04.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | US19960702281 | 23.08.1996 Original published format: US 702281 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0825671 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0825671 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825671 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q5/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
H01Q21/065 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0043 (EP,US);
H01Q21/005 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q25/02 (EP,US);
H01Q5/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/52] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ebene Gruppenantenne mit doppeltem Frequenzband | [1998/09] | English: | Dual frequency band planar array antenna | [1998/09] | French: | Antenne réseau plane à double bande de fréquence | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4864314 (BOND KEVIN J [GB]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 13; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0384777 (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11* column A *; | [X]US5394163 (BULLEN WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 4, line 47 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US5400042 (TULINTSEFF ANN N [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 2, line 28 - column 5, line 22; figures 1-6 * |