EP0785480 - Driving, steering and tensioning roll for belt loops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Lam F. 7 Cambray Drive Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1997/30] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300143.1 | 10.01.1997 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | US19960584764 | 11.01.1996 Original published format: US 584764 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0785480 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0785480 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785480 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
G03G15/754 (EP,US);
B65G39/16 (EP,US);
G03G15/755 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/30] | Title | German: | Antriebs-, Steuerungs- und Spannwalze für Bandschleifen | [1997/30] | English: | Driving, steering and tensioning roll for belt loops | [1997/30] | French: | Rouleau d'entraînement de commande et de tension pour les bandes de ruban | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]US4061222 (RUSHING ALLEN J) [DY] 1-3,6,7 [A] 4,5; | [Y]US4557372 (RAJAGOPAL GANESH [US]) [Y] 1-6; | [Y]US4621999 (GERHARDT KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 1-7; | [DYA]US4961089 (JAMZADEH FEREIDOON S [US]) [DY] 1,3,5-7[A] 4; | [DYA]US5078263 (THOMPSON PHILIP R [GB], et al) [DY] 1-3,6,7 [A] 4; | [DY]US5467171 (CASTELLI VITTORIO [US], et al) [DY] 1-3,6,7; | [PY]US5515139 (HOU SSUJAN [US], et al) [PY] 1-7 | by applicant | US4061222 | US4170175 | US4174171 | US4344693 | US4572417 | US4961089 | US5078263 | US5467171 |