EP0785632 - Spread spectrum signal receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Naoki 2-24-7-B208 Honda-cho, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300284.3 | 17.01.1997 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | JP19960007009 | 19.01.1996 Original published format: JP 700996 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0785632 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0785632 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785632 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H03G3/30, H04B1/16 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
H04B1/709 (EP,US);
H03G3/001 (EP,US);
H03G3/3052 (EP,US);
H04B1/69 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/30] | H04B1/16, H04B1/69 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/30] | Title | German: | Spread-Spektrum-Empfänger | [1997/30] | English: | Spread spectrum signal receiver | [1997/30] | French: | Récepteur à spectre dispersé | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5347534 (AKAZAWA SHIGEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 15 - line 47 * * column 5, line 5 - line 68 * * column 7, line 55 - line 61 *; | [PX]JPH08335901 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08335901 A 19961217 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [PX] 1,2,7,9 * abstract * |