EP0788278 - Signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murabayashi, Noboru Sony Corporation, 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Yamashita, Keitaro Sony Corporation, 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300400.5 | 22.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | JP19960034221 | 30.01.1996 Original published format: JP 3422196 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788278 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0788278 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/782 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
H04N5/781 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/1254 (KR);
G11B27/034 (KR);
H04N9/8205 (KR);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/32] | Title | German: | Signalbearbeitung | [1997/32] | English: | Signal processing | [1997/32] | French: | Traitement de signal | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 27.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/42] | 14.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0447293 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1,5,6,8,9,13,17,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5187589 (KONO MUTSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,6,8,9,13,17,19 * the whole document * |