EP0788074 - Apparatus for franking mail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST LIMITED South Street Romford Essex RM1 2AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states NEOPOST LIMITED South Street Romford, Essex RM1 2AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Daniel John 65 Hammonds Lane, Warley Brentwood, Essex CM13 3AH / GB | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/26] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | ||
Former [2001/23] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al HUGHES CLARK & CO, 114/118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | ||
Former [1997/32] | Loughrey, Richard Vivian Patrick, et al HUGHES CLARK & CO 114-118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300576.2 | 29.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | GB19960001948 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: GB 9601948 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788074 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0788074 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G07B17/00193 (EP,US);
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00233 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00637 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00709 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00725 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/32] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Frankieren von Poststücken | [1997/32] | English: | Apparatus for franking mail | [1997/32] | French: | Appareil d'affranchissement du courrier | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 02.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/04] | Request for further processing for: | 09.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5437441 (TUHRO RICHARD H [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 10 * * column 10, line 1 - line 17 * * abstract *; | [A]US4397542 (BRODESSER GERD R) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 3 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0604146 (NEOPOST LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 4 * * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |