Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0788076 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2000 | A3 | EP0788076 | 06.08.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9601897 | 31.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9601897D0 | 03.04.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9601897 | 31.01.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5884293 | 16.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9601897 | 31.01.1996 |