EP0788076 - Postage meter and method of forming franking indicia on mail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST LIMITED South Street Romford Essex RM1 2AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states NEOPOST LIMITED South Street Romford, Essex RM1 2AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbert, Raymond John Stirling Avenue Leigh-on-Sea, Essex SS9 3PP / GB | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/26] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | ||
Former [2001/23] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al HUGHES CLARK & CO, 114/118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | ||
Former [1997/32] | Loughrey, Richard Vivian Patrick, et al HUGHES CLARK & CO 114-118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300580.4 | 29.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | GB19960001897 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: GB 9601897 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788076 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0788076 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00637 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/32] | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine und Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Frankierzeichen auf Postsendungen | [1997/32] | English: | Postage meter and method of forming franking indicia on mail | [1997/32] | French: | Machine d'affranchissement et procédé pour réaliser les indices posteaux sur du courrier | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2010 | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/41] | 04.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/41] | 09.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Request for further processing for: | 04.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0480749 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 2 * * column 7, line 9 - line 26 * * column 10, line 52 - column 11, line 30 * * figures 1,3,9 *; | [Y]GB2161752 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, line 79 - line 127 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5775897 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820824), vol. 006, no. 161, Database accession no. (M - 151), & JP57075897 A 19820512 (HOSOKAWA KATSUPANSHIYO:KK) [A] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * * figure 1 * |