EP0803474 - Electrodeionization apparatus and process for purifying a liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 290 Concord Road Billerica Massachusetts 01821 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 290 Concord Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | ||
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states MILLIPORE CORPORATION 80 Ashby Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denoncourt, Jeffrey P. 343 Washington Street Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 02 /
Moulin, Jacques 12 Rue Manet 78 Plaisir / FR | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | ||
Former [1997/44] | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300606.7 | 30.01.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | US19960638040 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 638040 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0803474 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0803474 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803474 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/469, B01D61/48, B01D61/52, B01J47/08 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
C02F1/4695 (EP,US);
B01D61/48 (EP,US);
B01D61/52 (EP,US);
B01J47/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/4604 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/44] | C02F1/469, B01D61/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/44] | Extension states | AL | 11.02.1997 | LT | 11.02.1997 | LV | 11.02.1997 | SI | 11.02.1997 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Reinigung einer Flüssigkeit mittels Elektrodeionisation | [1997/44] | English: | Electrodeionization apparatus and process for purifying a liquid | [1997/44] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour purifier un liquide par électrodéionisation | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 29.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2003 | BE | 02.04.2003 | CH | 02.04.2003 | FI | 02.04.2003 | LI | 02.04.2003 | NL | 02.04.2003 | DK | 02.07.2003 | GR | 02.07.2003 | PT | 02.07.2003 | SE | 02.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
CH | 02.04.2003 | ||
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 02.04.2003 | |
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 02.04.2003 | |
LI | 02.04.2003 | ||
NL | 02.04.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 02.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3291713 (PARSI EDGARDO J); | [A]US3755135 (JOHNSON A); | [DA]US4226688 (KEDEM ORA, et al) [DA] 1,3,5-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0503589 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]); | [DA]US5308466 (GANZI GARY C [US], et al) [DA] 1,5,6,8,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2689826 | US2794770 | US2796395 | US2815320 | US2923674 | US2947688 | US3014855 | US3149061 | US3291713 | US3341441 | US3384568 | US3515664 | US3562139 | US3993517 | US4165273 | US4226688 | US4284492 | US4632745 | US4956071 | US5154809 | US5308466 | US5316637 |