EP0787596 - Ink-jet printing process, apparatus and materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, John Wei-Ping 1133 Ohstrom Park Webster, NY 14580 / US | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1997/32] | Pike, Christopher Gerard, et al Rank Xerox Ltd., Patent Department, Parkway Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300655.4 | 31.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | US19960596821 | 05.02.1996 Original published format: US 596821 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787596 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787596 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00, B41J11/00 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
B41M5/0011 (EP,US);
B41J11/0015 (EP,US);
B41J2/2114 (EP);
B41M7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/32] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren, Vorrichtung und Materialien | [1997/32] | English: | Ink-jet printing process, apparatus and materials | [1997/32] | French: | Procédé pour l'impression par jet d'encre, appareil et matériaux | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 06.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2157388 (MACARTHUR CHARLES J) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 32 - line 41 * * column 2, line 20 - line 33 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 39 * * figure 1; claims 1,3,4,7 *; | [A]US2518607 (ROBERT ERICKSON DONALD) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 35 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]US4501772 (LUXEDER WILLIAM P [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 20 - line 35 * * column 3, line 10 - line 35 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3434875 (METEOR SIEGEN APPARAT SCHMECK [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 9 * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 27 ** figure 1; claims 1-14 *; | [Y] - R.G.WELLER, "Paper pattern tinting method and apparatus", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, STAMFORD, CONNECTICUT, U.S.A., (199305), vol. 18, no. 3, page 247, XP000367969 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4251824 | US4410899 | US4412224 | US4463359 | US4532530 | US4601777 | US5139574 | US5145518 | US5207824 | US5207825 | US5220346 | US5223026 | US5281261 | US5356464 |