EP0792082 - Microwave oven control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Kwang-Keun 231-84 Maetan-4-Dong, Paldal-Gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | 02 /
Hong, Seok-Weon No. 202-1509 Wooman APT., Wooman-Dong, Paldal-Gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301035.8 | 18.02.1997 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | KR19960004363 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: KR 9604363 | [1997/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0792082 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0792082 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0792082 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/68, H05B6/80 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
H05B6/6411 (EP,US);
F24C7/08 (KR);
H05B6/6464 (EP,US);
H05B6/6482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/35] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung für Mikrowellenofen | [1997/35] | English: | Microwave oven control | [1997/35] | French: | Circuit de contrôle pour four à micro-ondes | [1997/35] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4725703 (PARK JONG D [KR]); | [A]US3436506 (SMITH PETER HAROLD); | [A]EP0359976 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |