EP0794353 - Cord fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIFCO INC. 184, Maioka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states NIFCO INC. 184, Maioka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Yasuhiko 1-2-18-408 Sone Nishimachi Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Michael Vincent GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [1997/37] | Application number, filing date | 97301042.4 | 18.02.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | JP19960078145 | 07.03.1996 Original published format: JP 7814596 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794353 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794353 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/10 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
F16G11/101 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3969 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3973 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3984 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB, IT [1997/37] | Title | German: | Seilklemme | [1997/37] | English: | Cord fastener | [1997/37] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage de cordon | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5361461 (ANSCHER JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1,2,5 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 53; figures 2-7 *; | [A]US5197166 (MEIER TERRENCE P [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 22 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-3,14,15 *; | [A]US5345657 (SHIMIZU HIDEKI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4288891 (BODEN OGDEN W) |