EP0791719 - Gripper block for coiled tubing injectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avakov, Vladimir A. 3313 Kristin Lane Duncan, Oklahoma 73533 / US | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301051.5 | 19.02.1997 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | US19960605606 | 22.02.1996 Original published format: US 605606 | [1997/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791719 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791719 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/22, B66D3/00, B65H51/14 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
B65G37/005 (EP,US);
B65H51/14 (EP,US);
B66D3/003 (EP,US);
E21B19/22 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0217 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/35] | Title | German: | Greiferblock an Vorschubvorrichtungen für einen aufgerichteten Rohrstrang | [1997/35] | English: | Gripper block for coiled tubing injectors | [1997/35] | French: | Mâchoire pour propulseur de tube flexible enroulé | [1997/35] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 09.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5094340 (AVAKOV VLADIMIR A [US]) [DX] 1-3 * figures 13,14; claim 5 *; | [A]US3841407 (BOZEMAN J); | [A]US4585061 (LYONS JR ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]US5279364 (JANTZEN LEON K [CA], et al) |