Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0798314
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.10.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
12.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.11.2001 [2001/48] |
31.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.07.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.07.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.05.1998 |
First examination report |
|
25.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.11.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] |
15.08.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] |