Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0798314 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2001 | B1 | EP0798314 | 01.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62322896 | 28.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2198295 | 12.12.2006 | C | CA2198295 | 29.09.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62322896 | 28.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69708488T | 27.06.2002 | T2 | DE69708488D1 | 10.01.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US62322896 | 28.03.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5691445 | 25.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US62322896 | 28.03.1996 |