EP0793077 - Position dectector circuit for an electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY 12025 Tech Center Drive Livonia, MI 48150 / US | [2001/29] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states Lucas Industries Inc. 1180 Sunrise Valley Drive Reston, Virginia 20191 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilke, Robert A. 127 Lohse Drive Winona, Minnesota 55987 / US | 02 /
Wiechmann, David P. RR3 Box 99E Winona, Minnesota 55987 / US | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1997/36] | Prutton, Roger MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301313.9 | 27.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | GB19960004274 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: GB 9604274 | GB19960020424 | 01.10.1996 Original published format: GB 9620424 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0793077 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0793077 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793077 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/244, G01R19/00 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
G01D5/244 (EP);
G05B19/21 (EP);
G05B2219/37169 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | G01D5/244 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/36] | Title | German: | Positionsgeberschaltung für einen elektrischen Motor | [1997/36] | English: | Position dectector circuit for an electric motor | [1997/36] | French: | Circuit pour la détection de la position d'un moteur électrique | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 25.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.03.2002 | [2004/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3346725 (R.B. ALLURED ET AL.) [A] 1,11 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 33; figure . *; | [A]EP0381643 (AMBIENT ENERGY DESIGN) [A] 1,6,7,9,11 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 27; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0393847 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1,2,6-8,11 |