EP0794258 - Saccharide composition comprising maltooligosylturanose and maltooligosylparatinose, its preparation and uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2005 | Correction of patent specification | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | ||
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aga, Hajime 880-225,Minato Okayama-Shi Okayama / JP | 02 /
Shibuya, Takashi 318, Shimobara, Souja-shi Okayama / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Shigeharu 2189, Atus Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | 04 /
Miyake, Toshio 3-23,1-Chome Ishima-Cho, Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301394.9 | 03.03.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | JP19960070915 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: JP 7091596 | JP19960099571 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: JP 9957196 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0794258 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0794258 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794258 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0794258 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/04, C12P19/18, A23L1/22, A61K7/00, A61K31/715, C07H3/06 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
C12P19/12 (KR);
A23L27/33 (EP,KR,US);
A23L29/30 (KR);
A61K31/7016 (KR);
A61K8/60 (KR);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C07H3/06 (EP,US);
C12P19/04 (EP,US);
C12P19/18 (EP,US);
C13K13/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/37] | Title | German: | Maltooligosyltaranose und Maltooligosylparatinose enthaltende Polysaccharidzusammensetzung, Herstellung und Verwendung | [1997/37] | English: | Saccharide composition comprising maltooligosylturanose and maltooligosylparatinose, its preparation and uses | [1997/37] | French: | Composition de polysaccharides contenant le maltooligosyltaranose et le maltooligosylparatinose, préparation et utilisation | [1997/37] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH05252974 ; | [A]EP0301522 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** see claims *; | [DA]EP0606753 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [DA] 1-8 * abstract * * claims 17-19 *; | [A] - NAGAI Y ET AL, "Characterization of alpha-glucosyltransferase from Pseudomonas mesoacidophila", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY., JAPAN SOC. FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND AGROCHEM. TOKYO, JP, (199410), vol. 58, no. 10, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 1789 - 1793, XP002115579 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - CHEETHAM P S, "The extraction and mechanism of a novel isomaltulose-synthesizing enzyme from Erwinia rhapontici", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL., LONDON, GB, (19840515), vol. 220, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 213 - 220, XP002115580 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 44, Database accession no. 93-347583, XP002115581 & JPH05252974 A 19931005 (HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU) [DA] 1-8 * abstract * |