EP0796716 - A method for manufacturing thermo-plastic sheets bearing embossed patterns thereon and an apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Yokoami 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0015 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Yokoami 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0015 / JP | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO. Ltd. 6-1, Yokoami 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0015 / JP | ||
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Atsushi Idemitsu Pet. Co., Ltd, 841-3 Kou, Shirahama-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Funaki, Akira Idemitsu Pet. Co., Ltd, 841-3 Kou, Shirahama-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Moriwaki, Ryuji Idemitsu Pet. Co., Ltd, 841-3 Kou, Shirahama-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1997/39] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301418.6 | 04.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | JP19960048746 | 06.03.1996 Original published format: JP 4874696 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796716 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796716 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/04 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
B29C43/222 (EP,US);
B29C59/046 (EP,KR,US);
B29C59/002 (KR);
B29C59/022 (KR);
B29C2043/486 (EP,US);
B29K2995/003 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung thermoplastischer Folie mit geprägtem Muster und Vorrichtung dafür | [1997/39] | English: | A method for manufacturing thermo-plastic sheets bearing embossed patterns thereon and an apparatus therefor | [1997/39] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de feuilles thermoplastiques pourvues de motifs gauffrés et dispositif associé | [2000/44] |
Former [1997/39] | Procédé pour la fabrication de feuilles thermoplastiques pourvues de motifs gauffrés et appareil pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 06.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 18.12.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.01.2002 | BE | 30.01.2002 | CH | 30.01.2002 | LI | 30.01.2002 | NL | 30.01.2002 | SE | 30.04.2002 | ES | 30.07.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 30.01.2002 | |
BE | 30.01.2002 | ||
CH | 30.01.2002 | ||
LI | 30.01.2002 | ||
NL | 30.01.2002 | ||
SE | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 30.01.2002 | |
CH | 30.01.2002 | ||
LI | 30.01.2002 | ||
NL | 30.01.2002 | ||
SE | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 30.01.2002 | |
LI | 30.01.2002 | ||
SE | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 30.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1504920 (HEINRICH FRIEDRICH SCHROEDER F) [X] 5 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0008382 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [DA]US4244683 (ROWLAND WILLIAM P) [DA] 5-8* the whole document *; | [DA]US4332847 (ROWLAND WILLIAM P) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE3319279 (MASCH UND WERKZEUGBAU MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 5 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure -; claim - * [Y] 1-4,6-8; | [DA]EP0171975 (AMERACE CORP [US]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0496260 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 14; figure -; claim - * [A] 5; | [A]EP0614748 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |