EP0795859 - Information record medium, apparatus for recording the same and apparatus for reproducing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tozaki, Akihiro, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Hidehiro, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Tokihiro, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Hiroshi, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Sawabe, Takao, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Head Office, No. 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 06 /
Yamamoto, Kaoru, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 07 /
Yoshio, Junichi, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorazawa-shi / JP | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301489.7 | 05.03.1997 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | JP19960059835 | 15.03.1996 Original published format: JP 5983596 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0795859 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0795859 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0795859 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, H04N5/04 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10592 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/38] | Title | German: | Datenaufzeichnungsmedium, Aufzeichnungsgerät und Wiedergabegerät | [1997/38] | English: | Information record medium, apparatus for recording the same and apparatus for reproducing the same | [1997/38] | French: | Support d'enregistrement d'information, appareil pour l'enregistrement, et appareil pour la reproduction | [1997/38] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AX] - "INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO FOR DIGITAL STORAGE MEDIA - PART 1 - CODING UP TO ABOUT 1.5 MBIT/S; SECTION 1: SYSTEM", ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29, (19920420), pages 1 - 57, XP002034584 [A] 1,5 * page 32, line 1 - page 34, line L; figures 1-A.1 * [X] 7-9 | [A] - "INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO FOR DIGITAL STORAGE MEDIA - PART 1 - CODING UP TO ABOUT 1.5 MBIT/S; SECTION 3: AUDIO", ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29, (19920420), pages 174 - 208, XP002034631 [A] 1,5 * page 197, paragraph 2.4.2.1 * | [A] - MACINNIS A G, "THE MPEG SYSTEMS SPECIFICATION: MULTIPLEX, CODING, AND CONSTRAINTS", SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF PAPERS, BOSTON, MAY 17 - 22, 1992, SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, (19920517), no. VOL. 23, pages 127 - 129, XP000479005 [A] 1,5,7 | [A] - MATTERN W, "AUDIO AND VIDEO COMPRESSION WITH THE MPEG STANDARDS", TEXAS INSTRUMENTS TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (199511), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 72 - 86, XP000646198 [A] 1,5,7 |