EP0795657 - A ceiling mounting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. Piekstraat 2 3071 EL Rotterdam / NL | [2001/43] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. Piekstraat 2 NL-3071 EL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brugman, Johannes A.H. Govert Flinkstraat 14 3351 VH Papendrecht / NL | 02 /
Horsten, Antonius J.J. Muurbloemweg 77 2555 NC The Hague / NL | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/43] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1997/38] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301649.6 | 12.03.1997 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | EP19960301767 | 14.03.1996 Original published format: EP 96301767 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0795657 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0795657 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0795657 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/30 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
E04B9/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/38] | Title | German: | Hängedeckenbauweise | [1997/38] | English: | A ceiling mounting system | [1997/38] | French: | Système de montage pour plafonds suspendus | [1997/38] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.10.2001 | IT | 24.10.2001 | DE | 25.01.2002 | GB | 12.03.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 24.10.2001 | |
DE | 25.01.2002 | ||
GB | 12.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | DE | 25.01.2002 | |
GB | 12.03.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | DE | 25.01.2002 | |
GB | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 12.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4715161 (CARRARO ET AL.) [X] 1,2,4,11,12,15,16 * column 3, line 11 - column 3, line 27 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 15 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 3,6,7,9,13,14,17,18; | [YA]FR2627527 (SOCI T DE PROFILAGET ET DE PLAGE DE M TAUX) [Y] 3,6,7,9 * page 2, line 6 - page 2, line 30 * * page 5, line 1 - page 5, line 36 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 8,15,16; | [Y]NL9301668 (VAN DIJK) [Y] 13,14 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 27 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0516330 (USG INTERIORS) [Y] 17,18 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 10 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 19 * * figures 2-11 * |