EP0796562 - Foaming coffee creamer and instant hot cappuccino [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield Illinois 60093 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | ||
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeller, Bary Lyn 3 Pondview Drive Brookfield, Connecticut 06804 / US | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301707.2 | 13.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | US19960617340 | 18.03.1996 Original published format: US 617340 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0796562 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0796562 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796562 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A23C11/00, A23F5/40 | [1997/39] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Schäumender Kaffeeweiser und instant heisser Cappuccino | [1997/39] | English: | Foaming coffee creamer and instant hot cappuccino | [1997/39] | French: | Blanchisseur à café moussant et cappuccino chaud instantané | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB971295 (PACKAGED PRODUCTS CORP) [A] 1,8* examples 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US3677770 (WITZEL FRANK) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 25 *; | [A]DE4103209 (DARBOVEN J J [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 2 - column 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US5350591 (CANTON SILVIA T [US]) [A] 1,8 * example 2 *; | [AD]DE4407361 (SCHOCK & CO NACHF GMBH DR [DE]) [AD] 1,2,8 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 34; claims 1-13 *; | [XP]WO9608153 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [XP] 1-19 * page 6, line 9 - line 30; example 1; claims 1-18 * | Examination | US5882716 |