EP0797095 - Gas sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Nobuhide 35-1, Aza-Yanowari, Ohaza-Kaniehonmachi Kanie-cho, Ama-gun, Aichi-pref.497 / JP | 02 /
Nakagaki, Kunihiko No. 201, 1-17-33, Tokugawa, Higashi-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi-pref. 461 / JP | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301891.4 | 20.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | JP19960064650 | 21.03.1996 Original published format: JP 6465096 | JP19970040829 | 25.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4082997 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0797095 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0797095 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797095 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/407, G01N27/419 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
G01N27/419 (EP,US);
G01N27/4074 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Gassensor | [1997/39] | English: | Gas sensor | [1997/39] | French: | Capteur de gaz | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 02.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4770760 (NODA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 65; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]US4824549 (HAMADA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 60; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0678740 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 11, line 20 - column 16, line 30; figures 2,11 ** column 21, line 35 - column 22, line 20 *; | [A]WO9530146 (COPCUTT ROBERT C [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 30 *; | [A]US5476001 (HOETZEL GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 35 - line 55; figures 2B,2C * * column 9, line 35 - line 55 * |