EP0798373 - System and method for adjusting the gas concentration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/40] | Gas concentration adjusting agent, gas concentration adjusting method, and gas concentration adjusting system | ||
[2002/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Araki, Hisaya, c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp. Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125 / JP | 02 /
Kamiya, Tomoo 41, Minami 1-chome, Kaminoshima-cho Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Kwon, A-Hon 10-38 Korien-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Harima, Yoshihiko, Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp. Inc. 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301941.7 | 21.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | JP19960070033 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: JP 7003396 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0798373 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0798373 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798373 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/04, C12N1/20 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
C12M41/34 (EP,US);
Y10S435/801 (EP,US);
Y10S435/809 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/40] | C12M1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/40] | Title | German: | Reagenz und Verfahren zur Regulierung der Zusammensetzung einer Gasmischung | [2002/01] | English: | System and method for adjusting the gas concentration | [2002/01] | French: | Réactif et procédé de réglage de la concentration d'un gaz | [2002/01] |
Former [1997/40] | Gaskonzentrationsregulierung | ||
Former [1997/40] | Gas concentration adjusting agent, gas concentration adjusting method, and gas concentration adjusting system | ||
Former [1997/40] | Réglage de la concentration d'un gaz | Examination procedure | 18.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS54105288 ; | [Y]JPS58141780 ; | [Y]JPS5779869 ; | [Y]EP0111583 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0120111 (MATE INC [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 5 - page 6; claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP0527228 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 4; claim 4 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 39, Database accession no. 79-70799B, XP002103735 & JPS54105288 A 19790818 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 39, Database accession no. 83-774553, XP002103736 & JPS58141780 A 19830823 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 26, Database accession no. 82-53058E, XP002103737 & JPS5779869 A 19820519 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * |