EP0841636 - Method and apparatus of inputting and outputting color pictures and continually-changing tone pictures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsukuba Software Laboratory Co., Ltd. 1089-11 Heta, Ooaza Iwai City Ibaraki / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states Tsukuba Software Laboratory Co., Ltd. 1089-11 Heta, Ooaza Iwai City, Ibaraki / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiuchi, Takahiko 6-15, Fukashi 2-chome Matsumoto City, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Haruki, Ryoji Shimoota, 20-2 Sakaki Morioka City, Iwate, Japan / JP | [2001/22] |
Former [1998/20] | 01 /
Horiuchi, Takahiko 6-15, Fukashi 2-chome Matsumoto City, Nagano / JP | ||
02 /
Haruki, Ryoji Yaguchisou-B, 70-4, Shibazaki Tsukuba City, Ibaraki / JP | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302051.4 | 25.03.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | JP19960317017 | 12.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31701796 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0841636 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0841636 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841636 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, G06T9/00 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G06T3/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/20] | G06T9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Eingabe und Ausgabe von Farb- und Grantonbildern | [1998/20] | English: | Method and apparatus of inputting and outputting color pictures and continually-changing tone pictures | [1998/20] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'entrée et sortie d'images en couleur ou en échelle de gris | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 05.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2001 | BE | 10.10.2001 | CH | 10.10.2001 | FI | 10.10.2001 | FR | 10.10.2001 | IT | 10.10.2001 | LI | 10.10.2001 | NL | 10.10.2001 | DK | 10.01.2002 | SE | 10.01.2002 | DE | 11.01.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
BE | 10.10.2001 | ||
CH | 10.10.2001 | ||
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
FR | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
DK | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
DE | 11.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
BE | 10.10.2001 | ||
CH | 10.10.2001 | ||
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
DK | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
DE | 11.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
BE | 10.10.2001 | ||
CH | 10.10.2001 | ||
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
DE | 11.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
BE | 10.10.2001 | ||
CH | 10.10.2001 | ||
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 10.10.2001 | |
CH | 10.10.2001 | ||
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 10.10.2001 | |
FI | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 10.10.2001 | |
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 10.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4005492 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [A]WO9602894 (JOHNSON GRACE COMPANY [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 12, line 7 - page 21 * * page 33, line 9 - page 34 *; | [A] - BASERI R ET AL, "REGION-BASED CODING OF IMAGES USING A SPLINE MODEL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (IC, AUSTIN, NOV. 13 - 16, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19941113), vol. 3, no. CONF. 1, pages 866 - 870, XP000522917 [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1994.413723 | [A] - LINNAN LIU ET AL, "OPTIMAL CONTOUR APPROXIMATION BY DEFORMABLE PIECEWISE CUBIC SPLINES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION A PATTERN RECOGNITION, LAHAINA, MAUI, HAWAII, JUNE 3 - 6, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910603), pages 638 - 643, XP000337418 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - YOSHIO YASUMOTO ET AL, "CORNER DETECTION AND CURVE REPRESENTATION USING CUBIC B-SPLINES", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, (19881201), vol. 19, no. 12, pages 73 - 80, XP000111776 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - EDEN M ET AL, "ON THE PERFORMANCE OF A CONTOUR CODING ALGORITHM IN THE CONTEXT OF IMAGE CODING PART I: CONTOUR SEGMENT CODING", SIGNAL PROCESSING EUROPEAN JOURNAL DEVOTED TO THE METHODS AND APPLICATIONS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING, (198507), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 381 - 386, XP000616721 [A] 1-16 * page 383, column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-1684(85)90001-5 | [A] - YUH-TAY LIOW, "A CONTOUR TRACING ALGORITHM THAT PRESERVES COMMON BOUNDARIES BETWEEN REGIONS", COMPUTER VISION GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, (19900501), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 313 - 321, XP000203298 [A] 1-16 * abstract * |