Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] |
28.08.1998 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] |
17.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn |