Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9845243 | Global Dossier | 15.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4391596B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | B2 | JP2002504093 | 05.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0975576 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2001 | B1 | EP0975576 | 02.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | EP98928193 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU737649B | Global Dossier | 23.08.2001 | B2 | AU8013098 | 30.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9807924 | 22.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2285423 | 02.01.2007 | C | CA2285423 | 15.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69801654T | 20.06.2002 | T2 | DE69801654D1 | 18.10.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100545611B | 25.01.2006 | B1 | KR20010006000 | 15.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002028964 | 07.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | EP9802030 | 02.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0870753 | Global Dossier | 14.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1130332C | 10.12.2003 | C | CN1255118 | 31.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ294277 | 10.11.2004 | B6 | CZ350499 | 16.02.2000 | A3 | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY118707 | 31.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2205820 | 10.06.2003 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW419460B | 21.01.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA982762 | 05.10.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP97302326 | 04.04.1997 |