EP0870753 - A process for the preparation of methacrylate esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Nevard, Edward John, et al Intellectual Property Department, ICI Materials, P.O. Box 90, Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Nevard, Edward John, et al Intellectual Property Department, ICI Materials, P.O. Box 90, Wilton Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302326.0 | 04.04.1997 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870753 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/38, C07C69/54 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
C07C67/38 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/38, C07C69/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1998/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Methacrylsäureestern | [1998/42] | English: | A process for the preparation of methacrylate esters | [1998/42] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'esters méthacryliques | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/03] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [1999/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0533291 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0539628 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1* the whole document * |