EP0801281 - Steam condensing apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hudson Products Corporation 6464 Savoy Drive, Suite 800 Houston Texas 77036-3321 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Hudson Products Corporation 6464 Savoy Drive, Suite 800 Houston, Texas 77036-3321 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldsmith, James David 21615 Park Brook Katy, Texas 77450 / US | 02 /
Kluppel, George Edward 2223 Leisure Lane Richmond, Texas 77469 / US | 03 /
Millas, George Steve 10419 Willowgrove Houston, Texas 77035 / US | 04 /
Strock, Thomas Wayne 6303 Sandava Avenue NW Canton, Ohio 44718 / US | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302365.8 | 07.04.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | US19960585342 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: US 585342 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801281 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801281 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801281 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F28B1/06, F28B9/10 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
F28B9/08 (EP,US);
F28B1/00 (KR);
F28B1/06 (EP,US);
F28B9/10 (EP,US);
F28B2001/065 (EP,US);
Y10S165/913 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Kondensieren von Dampf | [1997/42] | English: | Steam condensing apparatus and methods | [1997/42] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour condenser de la vapeur | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 13.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.04.2003 | ES | 08.04.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 07.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62284188 ; | [A]US4240502 (LARINOFF MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 68; figures 1,5 *; | [A]DE1008762 (GEA LUFTKUEHLER HAPPEL GMBH) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1218431 (GEA LUFTKUEHLER HAPPEL GMBH) [A] 1,7 * page 3, column R, line 36 - page 5, column L, line 32; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3888305 (GERZ HANS-BERND) [A] 1,7 * column 6, line 29 - column 8, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1365325 (G E A LUFTKUEHLERGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1,7 * page 5, column L, line 43 - page 6, column L, line 23; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880520), vol. 012, no. 169, Database accession no. (M - 699), & JP62284188 A 19871210 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | Examination | US4129180 |