EP0801468 - Improvements in or relating to integrated circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75243 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yaklin, Daniel A. 2525 Creighton Drive Garland, Texas 75044 / US | 02 /
Kornher, Kevin L. 4120 Kentshire Lane Dallas, Texas 75287 / US | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302366.6 | 07.04.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | US19960015063 | 08.04.1996 Original published format: US 15063 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801468 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0801468 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/0175, H03K19/0185, G06F13/40, H04L5/16 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
H03K19/01759 (EP,KR,US);
H03K19/0016 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/42] | H03K19/0175 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für integrierte Schaltungen | [1997/42] | English: | Improvements in or relating to integrated circuits | [1997/42] | French: | Dispositif pour circuits intégrés | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 20.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/28] | 19.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.03.2006 | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/28] | Request for further processing for: | 19.05.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3889072 (STEWART ALAN) [A] 1,14 * column 5, line 4 - line 23; figure 2 *; | [A]JPS6064547 ; | [A]JPS615657 ; | [A]JPH0674788 ; | [A]JPH0722867 ; | [A]JPS58156225 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850814), vol. 009, no. 197, Database accession no. (E - 335), & JP60064547 A 19850413 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1,5,8,14,16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860528), vol. 010, no. 145, Database accession no. (E - 407), & JP61005657 A 19860111 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940615), vol. 018, no. 315, Database accession no. (P - 1755), & JP06074788 A 19940318 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 095, no. 004, & JP07022867 A 19950124 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 12,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831209), vol. 007, no. 276, Database accession no. (E - 215), & JP58156225 A 19830917 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 12,13 * abstract * |