EP0812645 - Gas flow rate control device and brazing device with flow rate control for first and second gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daishin Industrial Co., Ltd. 1-7, Izuo 7-chome, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states Daishin Industrial Co., Ltd. 1-7, Izuo 7-chome, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Mitsuo, DAISHIN INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1-7, Izuo 7-chome Taisho-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Okamura, Takeshi, c/o DAISHIN INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1-7, Izuo 7-chome Taisho-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Otomi, Kazuaki, c/o DAISHIN INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1-7, Izuo 7-chome Taisho-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302604.0 | 16.04.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | JP19960123457 | 17.05.1996 Original published format: JP 12345796 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0812645 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0812645 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812645 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/04 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
B23K1/00 (KR);
B23K3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/51] | Title | German: | Gasdurchfluss-Kontrolleinrichtung und Lötvorrichtung mit Durchflusskontrolle für ein erstes und ein zweites Gas | [1997/51] | English: | Gas flow rate control device and brazing device with flow rate control for first and second gas | [1997/51] | French: | Dispositif de commande de débit d'un gaz et dispositif de brasage avec régulation de débit d'un premier et d'un deuxième gaz | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4860938 (CLARK CLAIR D [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 15 - line 31; figure 1 *; | [A]US4721458 (CONRAD HANS-JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 14; figure 1 *; | [DA]JPS6384761 ; | [DA]JPH0788639 ; | [DA]JPS61126968 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880824), vol. 012, no. 311, Database accession no. (M - 734), & JP63084761 A 19880415 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 095, no. 007, & JP07088639 A 19950404 (HITACHI LTD) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861030), vol. 010, no. 320, Database accession no. (M - 530), & JP61126968 A 19860614 (TOSHIBA CORP) [DA] * abstract * |