EP0804883 - Animal feed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata Minnesota 55391 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states Cargill Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, Minnesota 55391 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, James F. 14515 A Drive North Marshall, Michigan 49068 / US | 02 /
Storck, Dale H. 146 W. Maple Street Sugar Grove, Illinois 60554 / US | 03 /
Casper, David P. 13037 195th Avenue Elk River, Minnesota 55330 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303014.1 | 01.05.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | US19960641486 | 01.05.1996 Original published format: US 641486 | US19960699560 | 19.08.1996 Original published format: US 699560 | US19970795549 | 06.02.1997 Original published format: US 795549 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0804883 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0804883 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23K3/02, A23K1/18, A01H5/10, A61K38/27 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
A61K38/27 (EP,US);
A01H5/10 (EP,US);
A01H6/4684 (EP,US);
A23K30/10 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/27, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/45] | Extension states | AL | 22.05.1997 | LT | 22.05.1997 | LV | 22.05.1997 | RO | 22.05.1997 | SI | 22.05.1997 | Title | German: | Futtermittel | [1997/45] | English: | Animal feed | [1997/45] | French: | Produit alimentaire pour animaux | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 01.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/25] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5086041 (MITCHELL JAMES W [US]) [DA] 1,7-12 * example 3 *; | [A]US5145695 (SMITH STEVEN I [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5219596 (SMITH STEVEN I [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA] - E.A. KEITH ET AL., "Nutritional value of brown midrib corn silage for lactating dairy cows", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE., CHAPAIGN, ILLINOIS US, (1979), vol. 62, no. 5, pages 788 - 792, XP002095916 [DA] 1,7,8,13 * the whole document * | [DA] - E. BLOCK ET AL., "Brown midrib-3 corn silage and heat extruded soybeans for early lactating dairy cows", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE., CHAPAIGN, ILLINOIS US, (1981), vol. 64, no. 9, pages 1813 - 1825, XP002095917 [DA] 1,7,8,13 * page 1813, Abstract *; page 1818; table 5 * * page 1818, column 2, paragraph 1 * | [DA] - Y. BARRIÈRE ET AL., "Brown-midrib genes of maize: a review", AGRONOMIE, (1993), vol. 13, pages 865 - 876, XP002095918 [DA] 1,7,8,13 * page 871, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 872, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [A] - C.L. AUSTIN ET AL., "Influence of bovine somatotropin and nutrition on production and composition of milk from dairy cows", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE., CHAPAIGN, ILLINOIS US, (1991), vol. 74, no. 11, pages 3920 - 3932, XP002095919 [A] 1,7-12 * page 3920, Abstract *; page 3921; table 1 * * page 3924; table 5 * | [A] - R.J. GRANT ET AL., "Brown midrib sorghum silage for midlactation dairy cows", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE., CHAPAIGN, ILLINOIS US, (1995), vol. 78, no. 9, pages 1970 - 1980, XP002095920 [A] 1 * page 1970, Abstract *; page 1976; table 5 * * page 1976, column 1, paragraph 2 * |