EP0845597 - Flexible drive shaft and drive shaft and rotor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONO PUMPS LIMITED P.O. Box 14, Martin Street Audenshaw, Manchester M34 5DQ / GB | [1998/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silver, Michael 125 Tyldesley Road Atherton, Manchester M45 9AA / GB | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1998/23] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303078.6 | 06.05.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | GB19960025065 | 02.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9625065 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845597 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845597 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00, F16C3/02, F04C2/107 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
F04C2/1071 (EP,US);
F04C15/0061 (EP,US);
F16D1/076 (EP,US);
F16D1/0894 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [2001/26] |
Former [1998/23] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Flexible Antriebswelle und Antriebswellen-Rotormontage | [1998/23] | English: | Flexible drive shaft and drive shaft and rotor assembly | [1998/23] | French: | Arbre d'entraînement flexible et assemblage d'arbre d'entraînement et rotor | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 05.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2002
15.09.2003
WITHDRAWN Netzsch - Mohnopumpen GmbH Liebigstrasse 28 D-8264 Waldkraiburg / DE Opponent's representative Goetz, Rupert Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2002
15.09.2003
WITHDRAWN Netzsch - Mohnopumpen GmbH Liebigstrasse 28 D-8264 Waldkraiburg / DE Opponent's representative Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2002
WITHDRAWN Netzsch - Mohnopumpen GmbH Liebigstrasse 28 D-8264 Waldkraiburg / DE Opponent's representative Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | 16.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 27.10.2003 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0155755 (MONO PUMPS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-4,6-11 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 26 * * page 3, line 6 - line 13 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 9; figure 4 * * page 7, line 8 - line 15 *; | [Y]GB674293 (FIAT SPA) [Y] 1,2,6,7,9 * page 1, line 9 - line 51; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]FR2356048 (GKN TRANSMISSIONS LTD [GB]) [Y] 3 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 30; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE2027993 (ALLWEILER AG) [Y] 4 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 14; figure 1 *; | [DY]EP0399696 (MONO PUMPS LTD [GB]) [DY] 8,10,11 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 19; figure - *; | [A]GB839292 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [A] 1,2,7 * page 2, line 15 - line 52; figures 3,4 * |