EP0806542 - Steerable rotary drilling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Camco International (UK) Limited Hycalog, Oldends Lane Industrial Estate Stonehouse Gloucestershire GL10 3RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states Camco International (UK) Limited Hycalog, Oldends Lane Industrial Estate Stonehouse, Gloucestershire GL10 3RQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barr, John Denzil 2 Charlton Park Gate Cheltenham, Gloucestershire / GB | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Carter, Gerald, et al Arthur R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB | [1997/46] | Application number, filing date | 97303135.4 | 08.05.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | GB19960009659 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609659 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0806542 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0806542 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/06 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
E21B47/01 (EP,US);
E21B4/006 (EP);
E21B41/0085 (EP);
E21B44/005 (EP);
E21B7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1997/46] | Title | German: | Steuerbares Rotary-Bohrsystem | [1997/46] | English: | Steerable rotary drilling system | [1997/46] | French: | Système de forage rotatif à déviation réglable | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/47] | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2039093 (CONOCO INC); | [A]US4905774 (WITTRISCH CHRISTIAN [FR]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 45 - line 50 * * column 3, line 46 - line 49 * * column 4, line 9 - line 14 *; | [AD]GB2257182 (CAMCO DRILLING GROUP LTD [GB]) [AD] 7,8 * page 6, line 10 - line 19 *; | [YDA]GB2259316 (CAMCO DRILLING GROUP LTD [GB]) [YD] 1-4,6,7,9-15 * page 6, line 11 - line 27 * * page 12, lines 6-16 * [A] 8; | [Y]EP0594418 (HALLIBURTON CO [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * page 4, line 33 - line 37 * * page 7, line 30 - line 40 *; | [AD]US5325714 (LENDE BJORN [NO], et al); | [YD]US5419405 (PATTON BOB J [US]) [YD] 9-15 * column 28, line 7 - line 9 * * column 28, line 35 - line 40 * * column 30, line 67 - column 31, line 5 *; | [A]US5495237 (YUASA HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 5 * claim 1 * |