EP0810531 - Hot-plugging circuit for connecting peripherals to a computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boesch, Shannon C. 205 Parque Vista Drive Georgetown, Texas 78626 / US | 02 /
Haley, Charles L. 3505 Antelope Trail Temple, Texas 76504 / US | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al ABEL & IMRAY, Northumberland House, 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303496.0 | 22.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | US19960656799 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: US 656799 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810531 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
G06F13/4081 (EP,US);
G06F13/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/49] | Title | German: | Einsteckschaltung unter Spannung zum Anschluss von Peripheriegeräten an einen Rechner | [1997/49] | English: | Hot-plugging circuit for connecting peripherals to a computer | [1997/49] | French: | Circuit pour la connexion enfichable sous tension de dispositifs périphériques à un ordinateur | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/28] | 20.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0552873 (IBM [US]) [Y] 7-9,11,12,14 * page 3, column 4, line 28 - page 5, column 7, line 4; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0653759 (TEAC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,10* page 3, column 3, line 8 - line 58 *; | [XY] - "Circuits to Allow Cartridge Hot-Plugging", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198612), vol. 29, no. 7, pages 2877 - 2878, XP002040915 [X] 1-3,10,13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 7-9,11,12,14 |