EP0811845 - Devices and kits for testing serum and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXOID LIMITED Wade Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states OXOID LIMITED Wade Road Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8PW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Radcliffe, David Michael 12 Camrose Way Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 3AN / GB | 02 /
Head, Cheryl Mary Anne 4 Lloyds Lane, Ewhurst Road, Ramsdell Basingstoke, Hampshire RG26 5RF / GB | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Keith W Nash & Co, Pearl Assurance House, 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303538.9 | 23.05.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | EP19960304309 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: EP 96304309 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811845 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811845 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, B01L3/18, // G01N33/569 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
B01L3/18 (EP);
G01N33/54366 (EP);
G01N33/56922 (EP);
G01N33/56944 (EP);
G01N2333/205 (EP);
G01N2333/315 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Testsatz zum Test von Serum und dergleichen | [2003/07] | English: | Devices and kits for testing serum and the like | [1997/50] | French: | Dispositif et kit de test pour tester sérum et similaires | [1997/50] |
Former [1997/50] | Vorrichtung und Testatz zum Test von Serum und dergleichen | Examination procedure | 19.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US3770383 (PRICE R) [DY] 1-3,10 * column 4, line 53 - line 63; claim - *; | [Y]EP0112077 (OXOID LTD) [Y] 1-3,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0165001 (OXOID LTD) [A] 3,6,9 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 11 *; | [A]EP0391109 (SHOWA PHARM CHEM IND) [A] 4 * claim 3 *; | [A]EP0056563 (FINAMEX FINANCE CORP) [A] 1,5,7,8 * figure 3A *; | [A]EP0368624 (BIOTRACK INC) [A] 1,3 * page 6, line 43 - line 52 *; | [A]WO9601273 (RICAN LIMITED ;KELLEHER DERMOT (IE); WINDLE HENRY (IE); BYRNE WILL) |