EP0808605 - An optimal diagnosis point detector for noninvasive diagnosis of blood constituents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/48] | An optimal diagnosis point detector for noninvasive diagnosis of blood constituents and a noninvasive diagnostic device | ||
[2003/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Matan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Gil-won 302-1011 Shinwon Apt., Kumi-dong, Bundang-gu Sungnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Sang-min 428-901 Jugong Apt., Dunchon-dong, Kangdong-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kim, Hong-sig 669-2 Ilwon-dong, Kangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Won-ky 263 Changchun-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1998/52] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1997/48] | Crawford, Fiona Merle Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303559.5 | 23.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | KR19960017732 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: KR 9617732 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808605 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0808605 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808605 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/026, A61B8/06 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/00 (KR);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/026 (KR);
A61B5/0261 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | A61B5/14, A61B5/026, A61B8/06 | ||
Former IPC [1997/48] | A61B5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/48] | Title | German: | Optimaler Diagnosepunktdetektor für nichtinvasive Diagnose von Blutbestandteile | [2003/37] | English: | An optimal diagnosis point detector for noninvasive diagnosis of blood constituents | [2003/37] | French: | Détecteur pour chercher le point optimalisé pour le diagnostic non invasif des constituants du sang | [2003/37] |
Former [1997/48] | Optimaler Diagnosepunktdetektor für nichtinvasive Diagnose von Blutbestandteile und eine nichtinvasive Diagnosevorrichtung | ||
Former [1997/48] | An optimal diagnosis point detector for noninvasive diagnosis of blood constituents and a noninvasive diagnostic device | ||
Former [1997/48] | Détecteur pour chercher le point optimalisé pour le diagnostic non invasif des constituants du sang et dispositif de diagnostic non invasif | Examination procedure | 17.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 30.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0426358 (YANG WON SUCK [KR], et al) [A] 1,5,10,13; | [A]EP0587009 (SPACELABS MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1,10,13; | [A]US5370114 (WONG JACOB Y [US], et al)[A] 1,6,10,13 |