EP0810196 - Method for inhibiting polymerization of (meth) acrylic acid or esters thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mine, Norioki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp., Yokkaichi Plant 1, Toho-cho, Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 02 /
Segi, Tooru c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp., Yokkaichi Plant 1, Toho-cho, Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303569.4 | 27.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | JP19960131766 | 27.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13176696 | JP19960352604 | 16.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35260496 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810196 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810196 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/50, C07C67/62, C07C57/04, C07C69/54 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
C07C51/50 (EP,US);
C07C67/62 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/50, C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C67/62, C07C69/54 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Polymerisationsinhibierung von (Meth-)Acrylsäure und ihrer Ester | [1997/49] | English: | Method for inhibiting polymerization of (meth) acrylic acid or esters thereof | [1997/49] | French: | Procédé d'inhibition de la polymèrisation d'acide (méth-)acrylique et de ses esters | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.04.2000 | [2008/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3818079 (SATO R, et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [DA]US4127603 (BLJUMBERG ERNA A, et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2285983 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5504243 (SAKAMOTO KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * |