EP0810307 - Method of forming a compound semiconductor film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | For all designated states The University of Nottingham University Park Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NOTTINGHAM University Park Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | |||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | ||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NOTTINGHAM University Park Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bestwick, Timothy David 45 Oakthorpe Road Oxford, OX2 7BD / GB | 02 /
Hooper, Stewart Edward 4 Stone Street Oxford, OX4 1NH / GB | 03 /
Duggan, Geoffrey Kings Cottage, 6/7 High Street Deddington, Oxfordshire, OX15 0SJ / GB | 04 /
Cheng, Tin Sun 11 Goodwood Drive Toton, Nottingham, NG9 6HX / GB | 05 /
Foxon, Charles Thomas Bayley The Whitehouse, 76 Parkside Wollaton, Nottingham, NG8 2NN / GB | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1999/03] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford, OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1997/49] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303690.8 | 02.06.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | GB19960011471 | 01.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9611471 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0810307 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0810307 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | [1998/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810307 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C30B23/02, C30B29/40 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
C30B23/02 (EP,US);
C30B29/40 (EP,US);
C30B29/406 (EP,US);
H01L33/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/27] |
Former [1997/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Verbindungshalbleiterschicht | [1997/49] | English: | Method of forming a compound semiconductor film | [1997/49] | French: | Méthode pour la préparation d'un film semi-conducteur du type composé | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0345859 (ELECTRONIQUE & PHYSIQUE [FR], et al); | [Y]EP0390552 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1,11,13 * claim 1 *; | [AD]US5015353 (HUBLER GRAHAM K [US], et al); | [Y] - KIKUCHI ET AL, "Effects of V/III supply ratio on improvement of crystal quality of zincblende GaN grown by gas source molecular beam epitaxy using RF radical nitrogen source", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH., AMSTERDAM NL, (199505), vol. 150, pages 897 - 901, XP000627822 [Y] 1,11,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(95)80069-O | [A] - HAYWOOD ET AL., "Growth of GaSb by MOVPE: optimization of electrical quality with respect to growth rate,pressure temperature and III/V ratio", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH., AMSTERDAM NL, (198811), vol. 93, no. 1-4, pages 56 - 61, XP000035028 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(88)90506-4 | Examination | - A. Ishida et al., Appl. Phys. Lett. 67 (5), 31 July 1995 pages 665-666 |