EP0813289 - Rotor position encoder for an electrical machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED East Park House, Otley Road Harrogate North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED East Park House, Otley Road Harrogate, North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Copper, Andrew James 15 Knowle Avenue Leeds, LS4 2PQ / GB | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303757.5 | 03.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | GB19960012148 | 11.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9612148 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813289 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813289 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02K29/06, H02K29/00 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
H03M1/645 (EP,US);
H02P25/08 (KR);
G01D5/2455 (EP,US);
H02K29/06 (EP,US);
H02P25/0925 (EP,US);
H02P6/16 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/35] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI | ||
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rotorwinkelstellungsgeber für elektrische Maschinen | [1997/51] | English: | Rotor position encoder for an electrical machine | [1997/51] | French: | Codeur de position du rotor pour machines électriques | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 20.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.03.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 27.03.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5373206 (LIM JUN Y [KR]) [A] 1-10,11-19,20,21; | [A]EP0533413 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,11,20 |