EP0811930 - A ligning data transfer between two PCI1 bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pettey, Christopher, J. 9327 Rodgers Road Houston, Texas 77070 / US | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303796.3 | 04.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | US19960658752 | 05.06.1996 Original published format: US 658752 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0811930 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0811930 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
G06F13/4045 (EP,US);
G06F12/0886 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/14] |
Former [1997/50] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Datenübertragungsausrichtung zwischen zwei PCI-Bussen | [1997/50] | English: | A ligning data transfer between two PCI1 bus | [1997/50] | French: | Alignement de transfert de données entre deux bus PCI | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/40] | 11.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.03.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.03.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2286910 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 3 - page 21, paragraph 3 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0671691 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 23 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 57 * * abstract *; | [A]US5363485 (NGUYEN UOC H [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 27 - line 47 * * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 46 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 58 * * column A; figures 1-3; claims 1,2 * |